Financial history THE BEBINGTON PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 515549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.24k £981 £1.78k £2.24k £1.96k
Total expenditure £3.05k £1.30k £2.14k £2.15k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A