Trustees THE BEBINGTON PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 515549

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
robert Totty | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Noonan | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Heather Srivalsan Mrs | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alun Lambert | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Paul Srivalsan | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Barnes | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL FRANCIS WALLINGTON | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.