MAKING MUM PROUD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making Mum Proud wants to ensure that no young adult has to give up on their personal dreams and life goals following the loss of a parent or guardian. We are aiming to provide support to University students and facilitate access or continued access to the opportunities that come with pursuing further education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
sahil vohra | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ajit Pal Singh Thapar | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amit Singh Kalley | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.22k | £5.54k | £308 | £12.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHOM HAVE SUFFERED THE BEREAVEMENT OF A PARENT OR GUARDIAN THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND MENTAL HEALTH WELLBEING ACTIVITIES, B) SUPPORTING YOUNG PEOPLE TO SUSTAIN IN THEIR EDUCATION THROUGH MENTORING AND PEER SUPPORT, AND BY; C) PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO YOUNG PERSONS TO SUPPORT THEM IN THEIR EDUCATION DURING TIMES OF BEREAVEMENT AND RESULTING HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Police Station
West Square
MALDON
Essex
CM9 5AL
- Phone:
- 02038326591
- Email:
- making.mum.proud@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window