GAJANAN MAHARAJ UK PARIVAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to focus on various social causes as per the teachings of Shree Gajanan Maharaj such as food donation, volunteering for social causes, arranging group activities for social benefits, helping other social charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ketan Kadam | Chair | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paresh Deshmukh | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Meghana Kulkarni | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Sadalkar | Trustee | 25 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.99k | £13.69k | £18.75k | £20.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.86k | £9.16k | £12.07k | £13.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 May 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION AND SPECIFICALLY THE TEACHINGS OF SHREE GAJANAN MAHARAJ IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ARRANGING RELIGIOUS SERVICES, MASS PRAYERS AND RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Maine Street
READING
RG2 6AG
- Phone:
- 07825362359
- Email:
- deshmukh.paresh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
gmukpt.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window