RISE FOUNDATION LEICESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the good mental and physical health of people residing in Leicestershire, the surrounding areas and outside the UK through the provision of workshops, talks, seminars and advice on promoting healthy lifestyles. To promote the education of children and young people living in Leicestershire, the surrounding areas and outside UK by the provision of workshops and talks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 06 August 2020: Standard registration
- RISE FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Premkumar Christian Bakia Sundaram | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Subramanian Ganesan | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Balamurugan Nambi | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Faizal Rayan Marakkar | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thanthullu Vasu | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kaviarasan Karunanidhi | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Balaji Varadhan | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Saravanan Durairaj | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
suresh seetharaman | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gamma Manohara Prasad | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Thiagarajan Sridhar | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £2.85k | £7.80k | £16.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £736 | £4.64k | £16.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JUL 2020 as amended on 06 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE RESIDING IN LEICESTERSHIRE, THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, TALKS, SEMINARS AND ADVICE ON PROMOTING HEALTHY LIFESTYLES. B) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN LEICESTERSHIRE, THE SURROUNDING AREAS AND OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND TALKS ON PREPARATION FOR EXAMINATION AND IN OPPORTUNITIES IN HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 GARFIELD PARK
GREAT GLEN
LEICESTER
15 Garfield Park
Great Glen
LEICESTE
- Phone:
- 07939460710
- Email:
- priyasubbu2002@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window