Trustees FRIENDS OF THE ANXIETY DISORDERS RESIDENTIAL UNIT
Charity number: 1187761

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID VEALE | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Coughlan | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michaela Lutz | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Lock | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hoogland | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helene Juliiette Yvonne Lomenech | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Bevan | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Hamilton Hicks | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Clapson | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Medcalf | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOEL OLIVER | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.