Financial history BISHOPS WALTHAM MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1188140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £10.73k £4.96k £3.88k £4.93k
Total expenditure £0 £8.24k £5.08k £3.77k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k N/A N/A N/A