THE OPERA MAKERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Opera Makers produce immersive and bold adaptations of classical operas as well as new works, masterclasses, concerts and online opera content working with both emerging and established artists to promote opera to the broadest community as well as providing support and training to those at the start of their careers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stefan Francies Denjis De Wachter | Chair | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kyriaki Kaza | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELENI Tzampatzopoulou | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luci di Nordwall Cornish | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MORTIMER CLANCY | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.60k | £21.10k | £13.20k | £87.20k | £9.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285 | £30.77k | £7.79k | £86.05k | £13.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.35k | N/A | £30.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF MUSICIANS AT THE START OF THEIR PROFESSIONAL CAREERS, BY BRIDGING THE GAP BETWEEN FULL-TIME STUDY AND EMPLOYMENT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THROUGH: (I) THE PROVISION OF CAREER MENTORSHIP; (II) THE PROVISION OF MUSICAL AND THEATRICAL COACHING AND MASTERCLASSES; (III) THE PROVISION OF MEANINGFUL WORK OPPORTUNITIES AND EXPERIENCE; AND (IV) FOSTERING THE CREATION OF VALUABLE AND LONG-LASTING NETWORKS TO SUPPORT CAREER DEVELOPMENT. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THROUGH: (I) STAGING OF ACCESSIBLE OPERA PRODUCTIONS; (II) PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIALS WHICH ENGAGE TARGET AUDIENCES. (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING(BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THROUGH: (I) THE CREATION OF IMMERSIVE OPERA PRODUCTIONS; AND (II) THE DEVELOPMENT OF NEW COLLABORATIVE PRACTICES FOR CREATING AND STAGING OPERAS; (III) REINVENTING THE NARRATIVES OF STANDARD REPERTOIRE OPERAS AND COLLABORATING WITH PRACTITIONERS FROM OTHER DISCIPLINES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 GREENWAY
LONDON
SW20 9BQ
- Phone:
- 07789390814
- Email:
- info@theoperamakers.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window