OUR FUTURE HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health in the UK for the public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£80,268,925
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £62.51m | |
Other trading activities | £17.27m | |
Investments | £496.75k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£85,441,233
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £83.88m | |
Other | £1.56m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £62,000,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.56m | |
Charitable expenditure | £83.88m |
People

166 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 22 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 15 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 6 |
£120k to £130k | 6 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 May 2020: Standard registration
- OFH (Working name)
- EARLY DISEASE DETECTION RESEARCH PROJECT UK (Previous name)
- EDDRP (Previous name)
- EDDRP UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Sir John Irving Bell | Chair | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glenn Wells | Trustee | 17 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Deanfield | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ciaran Martin CB | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Osman | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Mary Calam | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard George Sexton | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Nevil Hennah | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Chambre | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kemal Zulfiqar Malik | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Charles Peakman | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sir Harpal Singh Kumar | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Fiona Mary Watt | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.36m | £64.84m | £26.52m | £80.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36m | £6.51m | £35.74m | £85.44m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.36m | £7.84m | £12.64m | £62.00m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £57.00m | £13.70m | £17.27m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.36m | £7.84m | £12.64m | £62.51m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £179.57k | £496.75k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.36m | £6.01m | £34.78m | £83.88m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £503.21k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £187.61k | £0 | £672.36k | £848.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £969.14k | £1.56m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £2.04m | £3.79m | £6.57m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £781.60k | £61.41m | £43.42m | £34.79m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £751.86k | £5.09m | £10.88m | £13.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 SEP 2019 as amended on 09 Dec 2020 as amended on 22 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND ADVANCE HUMAN HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY ENGAGING IN, ENCOURAGING AND SUPPORTING: 2.1.1 INVESTIGATIONS INTO THE SEPARATE AND COMBINED EFFECTS OF GENETIC, ENVIRONMENTAL (INCLUDING LIFESTYLE, PHYSIOLOGICAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL EXPOSURES) AND OTHER FACTORS ON HUMAN HEALTH AND WELFARE AND ON THE RISK, EARLY DETECTION AND CAUSATION OF DISEASES IN THE HUMAN POPULATION; 2.1.2 THE ESTABLISHMENT, HOLDING, OPERATION, MANAGEMENT, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, EXPANSION, IMPROVEMENT AND SAFEGUARDING OF A COLLECTION OF BIOMEDICAL, BIOCHEMICAL, EPIDEMIOLOGICAL, GENETIC AND OTHER DATA AND BLOOD AND OTHER BIOLOGICAL AND BIOCHEMICAL SAMPLES OBTAINED AND DEVELOPED THROUGH, FOR THE PURPOSE OF AND/OR IN CONNECTION WITH SOME OR ALL OF THE INVESTIGATIONS REFERRED TO IN ARTICLE 2.1.1 AND PERTAINING TO A COHORT OF HUMAN PARTICIPANTS, FOR USE IN A RESEARCH, KNOWLEDGE AND INFORMATION RESOURCE; 2.1.3 THE DISCOVERY, INVENTION, IMPROVEMENT, DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF TREATMENTS, CURES, DIAGNOSTICS AND OTHER MEDICINAL AGENTS, METHODS AND PROCESSES THAT MAY IN ANY WAY RELIEVE ILLNESS, DISEASE, DISABILITY OR DISORDERS OF WHATEVER NATURE IN HUMANS; 2.1.4 RESEARCH INTO BIOLOGICAL AND MEDICAL SCIENCES AND OTHER DISCIPLINES WHICH MAYCONTRIBUTE TO THE IMPROVEMENT OF HUMAN HEALTH AND WELFARE ('BIOSCIENCES'); AND 2.1.5 THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF ANY OF THE BIOSCIENCES. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Our Future Health
9 Holborn
LONDON
EC1N 2LL
- Phone:
- 02045291688
- Email:
- info@ourfuturehealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window