Accounts and annual returns OLD HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515563
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 March 2025 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 April 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 August 2021 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required