MILES4MYLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MILES4MYLES raises funds by organising and arranging charitable events. The type of events are sponsored runs, golf tournaments, gym challenges, internet team quiz's, cocktail parties an annual "Birthday Bash" dinner and direct sponsorship. We are also a member of "Just Giving".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Devon
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 August 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Morrow | Chair | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Emma Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Harrison | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.29k | £518 | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £621 | £1.53k | £879 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2024 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2024 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 20 - 30 RESIDING IN ENGLAND OR WALES WHO ARE CURRENTLY SUFFERING ILL HEALTH BYWAY OF TERMINAL CEREBRAL TUMOUR BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO PURCHASE OR ACHIEVE ANY LIFESTYLE IMPROVEMENT OR AMBITION, HELP COVER THE COST OF FAMILY RESPITE CARE AND SPECIALIST APPROVED EQUIPMENT REQUIREMENTS TO MAKE THEIR LIFE EASIER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 ESSEX CLOSE
CHURCHDOWN
GLOUCESTER
GL3 1NZ
- Phone:
- 07772309807
- Email:
- mikeandlizzyjones@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window