CHARLES HODGSON FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 October 1984: Standard registration
- 02 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 28 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 15 November 2005 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 15 November 2005 | 15 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 AUGUT 1984
Charitable objects
PRESERVING AND SUPPORTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROMOTION OF LIFE AND GOOD HEALTH AMONGST CHILDREN RESIDING IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE DEED).
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window