Governing document THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BRIDGNORTH HOSPITAL

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/07/1984 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1990 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 24 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 23 APR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO SUPPORT: -THE CARE AND WELLBEING OF PATIENTS, FORMER PATIENTS, THEIR RELATIVES, CARERS AND STAFF WHO ARE IN OR ATTENDING BRIDGNORTH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (“THE HOSPITAL”) - THE HOSPITAL’S WORK WITHIN THE COMMUNITY OF SOUTH EAST SHROPSHIRE LOCALITY AREA, SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH NHS TRUST AND - THE WORK OF AND SERVICES PROVIDED BY ANY NHS TRUST (OR THEIR EQUIVALENT OR LATER EQUIVALENT) FROM THE HOSPITAL UNDER SERVICE LEVEL AGREEMENT WITH SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY HEALTH NHS TRUST.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.