THE DREAM TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising, grant giving, direct help (CV training, interview techniques, introduction to work experience opportunities)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annesley George Abercorn FRSA | Chair | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.10k | £850 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £900 | £458 | £455 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 AND 30 WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILLNESS, OR OTHER SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES THAT SHARE A SIMILAR PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DREAM TRUST UK
71-75 SHELTON STREET
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 02036864892
- Email:
- mail@dreamtrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window