M&C FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
M and C Foundation provides sports activities such as martial arts, Teakwondo, Basketball, boxing, football and sports activities that proves physical and mental health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASSAD GULAID AYAANLE | Chair | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hamdi Suleyman | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malel Barre | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD ABDULQADIR WARSAME | Trustee | 10 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdimajib SAID | Trustee | 10 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.34k | £44.03k | £43.49k | £52.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.68k | £53.81k | £32.55k | £79.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE PERSONS BY VIRTUE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN LONDON BY: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON HOUSING AND WELFARE BENEFITS 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
5A Uxbridge Road
LONDON
W12 8LJ
- Phone:
- 07507353570
- Email:
- m.c.foundation.ltd@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window