CHEKA SANA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CSF's primary aim is to enable and create positive, sustainable change in the lives of children living alone and at risk on the streets in Tanzania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Albert John Merilion | Chair | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniella Durston | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Christopher Page | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Serena Kelly | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Benjamin Obendorf | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.81k | £20.29k | £58.56k | £19.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.49k | £28.37k | £56.98k | £27.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT LOCAL SCHOOLS IN MWANZA, TANZANIA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE RELEVANT SCHOOLS; (B) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE AND WOMEN OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF TANZANIA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VICTIMS OF CHILD ABUSE, YOUNG PEOPLE AND WOMEN IN TANZANIA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT; (D) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGH UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN TANZANIA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY SEE FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (E) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN TANZANIA BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO HELP THEM OVERCOME THE DISADVANTAGE ARISING FROM THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE 3(E) "SOCIALLY EXCLUDED" MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ON ALCOHOL OR DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS, HOMELESSNESS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY); (F) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN TANZANIA, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL; AND (G) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CAPITO DRIVE
NORTH HYKEHAM
LINCOLN
8
Capito Drive
LN6 9FZ
- Phone:
- 07593791789
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window