HEMPSTALLS PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1188628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organise events in school for parents to attend to raise extra funds to enhance the educational experience of their children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,990
Total expenditure: £8,134

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amelia Bell Chair 29 January 2020
None on record
Victoria Dalgarno Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
Kirsty Robinson Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
Sarah Baddeley Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.92k £4.54k £2.91k £7.99k
Total expenditure £6.89k £2.43k £2.57k £8.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 July 2024 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEMPSTALLS PRIMARY SCHOOL
COLLARD AVENUE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 9LH
Phone:
01782950082