Accounts and annual returns VOLUNTEER CENTRE FOR THE BOROUGH OF MELTON

Charity Number: 515573
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 22 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 06 October 2004 On Time