VOLUNTEER CENTRE FOR THE BOROUGH OF MELTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 October 1984: Standard registration
- 08 November 2006: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 November 2006: Funds transferred to 1102776 VOLUNTARY ACTION MELTON
- MELTON VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Working name)
- MELTON MOWBRAY VOLUNTEER BUREAU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130.92k | £152.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.45k | £130.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 26 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 22 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 06 October 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 06 October 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES, AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES, THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF.
Area of benefit
MELTON MOWBRAY AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window