THE PARISH OF THREE SAINTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are primarily focussed on the advancement of Religion, providing Religious focus at our primary schools and providing pastoral support to all our parishioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 March 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hannah | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Neil Biddiscombe | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HENRY COUNSELL | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Pauline Talbot Chadwick | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mary Daintree | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE COLE | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES MARY JAMES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Anne COLES | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise McClean | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carole Carter | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.38k | £104.63k | £137.70k | £85.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.33k | £137.73k | £133.75k | £111.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OFFICE
CHURCH ROAD
EAST BRENT
HIGHBRIDGE
TA9 4HZ
- Phone:
- 01278769082
- Email:
- office.tpots@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window