CLIFFE VILLAGE INSTITUTE (WAR MEMORIAL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cliffe Village Institute is a village hall facility and is a memorial to those from the parish who fought and died in both World Wars. It has modern facilities and is available for hire for private functions and regular activities for all ages. Income is from hire and fundraising events, with all money raised being used to finance the running and upkeep of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIRIAM MARSHALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA WOOD | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BEADLE | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM REGINALD HODGE | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES WILLIAM CLARK | Trustee | 15 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
IAN RICHARD SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.49k | £20.20k | £9.29k | £11.83k | £10.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.32k | £6.77k | £7.91k | £17.49k | £9.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.45k | £18.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 19 DECEMBER 1923
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A VILLAGE INSTITUTE AND KNOWN AS THE CLIFFE VILLAGE INSTUTUTE (WAR MEMORIAL) OR FOR SOME SIMILAR PURPOSE FOR THE USE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE AND RESIDENTS OF THE TOWNSHIP OF CLIFFE CUM LAND AS THE TRUSTEES OR ANY COMMITTEE OR PERSONS ACTING BY DELEGATION UNDER THE TRUSTEES AS HEREINAFTER MENTIONED SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF CLIFFE CUM LAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Chapelfields
Cliffe
SELBY
North Yorkshire
YO8 6NW
- Phone:
- 01757638746
- Email:
- DEKKAMARSHALL1947@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window