CYLCH MEITHRIN A TI A FI CWARTER BACH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin Cwarter Bach provides education of preschool children aged 2 years to 5 years in Cwarter Bach and surrounding areas, through the medium of the Welsh language in a friendly and caring environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 27 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Jane Thomas | Chair | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Richard Rees | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nia Wyn Turner | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Jones | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane James | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Morgan | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Gaynor Tonen | Trustee | 27 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.99k | £32.69k | £27.02k | £23.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.29k | £28.32k | £27.62k | £22.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.83k | £3.01k | £3.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN CWARTER BACH AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEUADD GYHOEDDUS BRYNAMAN
HALL STREET
BRYNAMAN
RHYDAMAN
SA18 1SF
- Phone:
- 07518120853
- Email:
- cmb.tiafi@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window