THE SABRE CLUB CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sabre Club Charitable Foundation was created to benefit the public by providing grant support to encourage a broader level of community participation in the sport of sabre fencing. The charity is particularly interested in supporting young people to achieve their full potential but will also seek to support others if the community will benefit as a whole, especially through grants to clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Ali Mansoori | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Esimaje-Heath | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £801 | £3.46k | £619 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £142 | £2.86k | £310 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO PARTICIPATE IN THE SPORT OF SABRE FENCING AT ALL LEVELS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 BEULAH HILL
LONDON
SE19 3LS
- Phone:
- 07311214127
- Email:
- Trustees@tsccf.uk
- Website:
-
tsccf.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window