Trustees COMMUNITY LIFE HUB GROUP
Charity Number: 1189779

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Anne O'Neill | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marion Bullivant | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Norman Moulsley | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Mary Bealey | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Barbara Jackson | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Moulsley | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Kay Barr | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Lionel Rowbury | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gater | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Angela Edwards | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.