MERAJ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) The relief of poverty B) The relief of sickness C) The preservation and protection of good health D) The relief and assistance of people who are victims of natural disaster, trouble or catastrophe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 23 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMED MERAJ | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Fathema Begum | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Muzammel Meraj | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341 | £1.01k | £9.70k | £9.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356 | £300 | £7.94k | £9.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN BANGLADESH, OR ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING AND COORDINATING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SERVICES, SUCH AS HOUSING, THE PROVISION OF BASIC HYGIENE, CLOTHING AND OTHER AMENITIES, FOODBANKS, EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES FOR THOSE IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
209 Clayhall Avenue
ILFORD
Essex
IG5 0NZ
- Phone:
- 07786527927
- Email:
- meraj@newcapitalestates.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window