ST LUKE'S CHESHIRE HOSPICE

Charity number: 515595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity's activities include In-care, day-care, therapies, home befriending service, lymphoedema clinic, benefits advice,counseling,education, research into palliative care thus improving services Also Development of a model for dementia care for the end of life, development of an infrastructure for palliative care research, development of a model of a Public Health/end of life approach.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1984: Standard registration
  • 25 October 2024: Funds received from 1118158 OVER HALL COMMUNITY ENTERPRISES LIMITED
  • 19 March 2025: Funds received from 1106114 THE CHESHIRE FESTIVAL OF SPEECH AND DRAMA
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MIKE RIDLEY Chair 19 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BUNBURY
Received: On time
Daniel John Morear Trustee 04 November 2024
None on record
Rachael Lisa Willaims Trustee 26 June 2024
None on record
Zoe Ahearne Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Dr Samuel Robert Malton Trustee 28 June 2023
None on record
Katharine Gibbs-Blythe Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Wendy Davies Trustee 29 January 2020
None on record
Tina Cookson Trustee 28 June 2019
None on record
Lee Greenbury Trustee 28 June 2019
None on record
Graham Peter Jones Trustee 27 June 2018
None on record
COLIN PETER NORMAN Trustee 27 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.20m £5.67m £5.65m £6.13m £5.75m
Total expenditure £4.70m £4.78m £4.49m £5.05m £5.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £707.42k £1.63m £1.19m £804.56k £802.10k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.15m £1.75m £2.09m £2.65m £1.87m
Income - Other trading activities £2.22m £1.50m £2.12m £2.38m £2.66m
Income - Charitable activities £745.28k £1.71m £952.02k £944.19k £982.04k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.94k £84.13k £100.35k £150.52k £247.42k
Income - Other £0 £629.17k £385.62k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £634.14k £603.21k £914.38k £1.38m £354.70k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.16m £3.32m £3.02m £3.39m £3.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.54m £1.12m £1.47m £1.66m £1.91m
Expenditure - Governance £34.95k £34.30k £36.06k £44.17k £46.28k
Expenditure - Grants institution £50.59k £25.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £10.61k £5.70k £30.65k £0 £31.28k
Expenditure - Other £0 £343.32k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.62m £2.21m £2.22m £2.35m £2.42m
Long-term investments £2.83m £4.00m £4.25m £4.20m £4.55m
Other assets £1.30m £2.68m £3.11m £3.63m £3.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £625.71k £1.24m £548.42k £549.25k £262.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Grosvenor House
Queensway
WINSFORD
Cheshire
CW7 1BH
Phone:
01606551246