NORTH GUILDFORD FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides food and household items to needy individuals and families in the Guildford area. In some cases it helps with household gas and electricity payments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 March 2020: Standard registration
- 31 July 2024: Funds received from 1174447 ARABELLA AND JULIAN SMITH FAMILY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Andrew Herring | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clive Couzens | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Geoffrey Robert Andrews | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Porter | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Fothergill | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Anne Watts | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Williams | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.62k | £107.88k | £169.00k | £138.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.60k | £109.20k | £150.51k | £146.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 MAR 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN GUILDFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME-TO-TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES AND TO PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SUPPORTED BY CHURCHES IN GUILDFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Clares' Church
Cabell Road
Guildford
GU2 8JW
- Phone:
- 07583025435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window