LITTLEHAM COMMUNITY YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and help children and young people aged 9-13 living in the Littleham Ward of Exmouth through the provision of recreational and leisure activities provided in the interest of social welfare designed to improve their conditions of life and provide support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 November 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 19 March 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor David Poor | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Packer | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Brian Bailey | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET LEE | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Howard | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 222 days | |
Annual return | 27 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days | |
Annual return | 27 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 953 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 953 days | |
Annual return | 27 November 2020 | 30 October 2022 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 November 2020 | 30 October 2022 | 398 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 9 – 13 LIVING IN THE LITTLEHAM WARD OF EXMOUTH THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
146 Salterton Road
EXMOUTH
EX8 2PD
- Phone:
- 01395271615
- Email:
- LCYC191@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window