AL-ZAHRA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and advancement of education in accordance with Shia school of thought. The relief and assistance of people in need, locally or internationally, who are the victims of poverty or natural disaster, by providing financial aid or supplying basic necessities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MOHAMMAD REZA NADEMI | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Mohammadsadegh Dalvandi | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Reza Ahoui | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Majid Maleki | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Maram Hossein Ghanizadeh | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £14.54k | £22.63k | £22.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £11.30k | £16.46k | £24.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 11 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
1- THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF THE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI SHARIA (WHICH EXPRESSION MEANS THE LAWS AND RULES OF THE SHIA SCHOOL OF THOUGHT, AND HEREINAFTER REFERENCES TO THE SHARIA SHALL BE CONSTRUED AS REFERENCES TO THE SHIA ITHNA ASHERI SHARIA); 2- THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SHARIA; 3- THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN NEED, LOCALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY, WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF POVERTY OR NATURAL DISASTER, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AID OR SUPPLYING BASIC NECESSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CITY COMMERCE CENTRE
MARSH LANE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 3EW
- Phone:
- 07908268003
- Email:
- info@alzahra.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window