Trustees ADLINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 515610

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Stephens | Chair | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Whitehurst | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ayten Gorgun-Smith | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bates | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Ellis | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Akerman | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Shaw | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bernice Dwyer | Trustee | 03 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.