THE CORNWALL DIABETIC EDUCATION CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support persons with diabetes and their carers, especially in aspects of education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 March 2020: CIO registration
- 21 October 2020: Funds received from 1000555 THE CORNWALL DIABETIC EDUCATION CENTRE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON FLEMING | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Dickinson | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Chant | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Veall | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Merrin | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Robertson | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATSY HUGHES | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anita England | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
charles Holman | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50 | £0 | £5.57k | £257 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £50 | £147 | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH IN CORNWALL AMONG PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DIABETIC DISORDERS AND THOSE CARING FOR SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) SUPPORTING A SPECIALIST CENTRE AT THE ROYAL CORNWALL HOSPITAL WHICH PROVIDES EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND ADVICE FOR SUCH PERSONS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE STANDARD OF CARE FOR SUCH PERSONS AND IMPROVING EFFECTIVE CONTROL OF DIABETIC DISORDERS; B) SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO DIABETIC DISORDERS, THE USEFUL RESULTS OF WHICH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenbank House
Feock
TRURO
Cornwall
TR3 6RG
- Phone:
- 01872254655
- Email:
- fleminggreenbank@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window