Accounts and annual returns HIGH STREET GROUP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191192
Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 April 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days