HIGH STREET GROUP FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 08 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Ronald Forrest | Chair | 08 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 105 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 471 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 836 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 April 2022 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1201 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT HADRIAN SCHOOL NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. (2) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: (A) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (B) PROVIDING THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (3) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES. (4) TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE NOT UNDERGOING FORMAL EDUCATION BY FACILITATING THEIR ENGAGEMENT IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ANGLING, BALLOONING, BILLIARDS POOL AND SNOOKER, CROSSBOW, RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING, FLYING, GLIDING, MOTOR SPORTS AND PARACHUTING. (5) TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF BOXING AND FOOTBALL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORTS OF BOXING AND FOOTBALL. (6) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (7) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Street Group Foundation
6TH FLOOR STOCKBRIDGE HOUSE
TRINITY GARDENS
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 2HJ
- Phone:
- 01912114120
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window