YOUTH REALITIES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aims: Reduce abuse within teenage relationships Increase awareness of relationship abuse & challenge violence through education Empower young peoples personal development & growth Provide advocacy and trusted support for young survivors Our activities: Specialist YP/IDVA support and advocacy Creative group activities Professionals training Employment opportunities Research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £169,176 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnet
- Brent
Governance
- 20 December 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Lewis | Chair | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karly Arber | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Joanna Silver | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ana Victoria Jane FitzSimons | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Niki Michael | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Uma Nayer | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roslyn Adonteng | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Simon Meyrick | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARA KIRKPATRICK | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £141.96k | £257.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.35k | £194.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £169.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING PUBLIC BENEFITS: 1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11-25 LIVING OR STUDYING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND CREATIVE WORKSHOPS TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BETTER UNDERSTAND TEENAGE RELATIONSHIP ABUSE AND WIDER SOCIAL ISSUES. 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11-25 LIVING OR STUDYING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET WHO HAVE EXPERIENCE OF RELATIONSHIP ABUSE OR OTHER FORMS OF ABUSE BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY BY TRAINED PROFESSIONALS. 3) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11-25 LIVING OR STUDYING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND EXPERIENCES OF RELATIONSHIP VIOLENCE AND ABUSE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pulse Community Flat
Flat 15 Osler Court
9 Charcot Road
LONDON
NW9 5XW
- Phone:
- 02039165709
- Email:
- info@youthrealities.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window