THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOUSE OF FAVOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activities of the organisation are Advancement of charitable faith The advancement of Christian living and lifestyle Education and training Poverty alleviation locally and overseas Promotion of Christian living and lifestyle Supporting and collaborating with other charities Facilitating community cohesion and provision of social and community services Promotion of community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 07 February 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agnes Mwakidasi | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pastor Yejide Afuape | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alice Ediare | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.86k | £51.44k | £67.13k | £104.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.46k | £50.02k | £49.95k | £41.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 JAN 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Parry Close
EASTBOURNE
East Sussex
BN23 7TU
- Phone:
- 07462120962
- Email:
- rccgeastbourne@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window