AFGHAN SPORTS TRUST (AST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Afghan Sports Trust helps fund grassroots sports organisations and sports clubs in Afghanistan. This is achieved by awarding grants to sports clubs and events which we know can make a real difference to people's lives. Full details of how to apply and our eligibility criteria can be found on our website www.afghansportstrust.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 20 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Bingham CEO | Chair | 12 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Stefano Franzoso | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zeinab Rezaie | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith MacIntosh | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Juliane Weymann | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.42k | £16.48k | £18.99k | £8.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.40k | £9.37k | £10.33k | £11.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFGHANISTAN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5a Pipers Avenue
HARPENDEN
AL5 1HB
- Phone:
- +447747047591
- Email:
- info@afghansportstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window