LIKE U

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tackling anti-social behavior, enhancing multi-cultural relationships, promoting well being of European Minorities, supporting European migrants living in Great Britain
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 February 2022
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Sandwell
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 14 February 2020: CIO registration
- 29 August 2023: Funds received from 1147433 EMERGING COMMUNITIES NETWORK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Przemyslaw Pluta | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Cendrowski | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/02/2021 | 13/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.49k | £214.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.33k | £205.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.70k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.87k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 510 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 510 days | |
Annual return | 13 February 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 February 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 February 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN PEOPLE, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE WEST MIDLANDS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE EUROPEAN MIGRANT COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE EUROPEAN MIGRANT COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE EUROPEAN MIGRANT COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION.Ö 1. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF ANXIETY, DEPRESSION, PERSONALITY DISORDER, PSYCHOSIS AND EATING DISORDERS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL WELLBEING, RECOVERY AND CRISIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Like U CIO
2 Westbury Street
WORCESTER
WR1 1NW
- Phone:
- 07990542134
- Email:
- leszek@likeu.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window