PERSHORE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pershore Community Church exists to enable people to connect with God, connect with each other and to connect the lost with God. The church is active in providing engaging opportunities for worship, prayer and discipleship; events which encourage people to build lasting friendships; activities that demonstrate God's love and share the good news of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 20 July 2020: CIO registration
- 01 March 2024: Funds received from 1144119 PERSHORE COMMUNITY CHURCH
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carys Joy Ellis | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iain Graeme Bailey | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Neil Stephens | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Scott Michael Andrews | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £40 | £91.10k | £45.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £20.38k | £21.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN PERSHORE, WORCESTERSHIRE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pershore Community Church
PO Box 2048
PERSHORE
Worcestershire
WR10 9EY
- Phone:
- 01386552597
- Email:
- info@pershorecc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window