Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS AT BROADWATER COFE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1188229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 27 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 April 2022 278 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 April 2022 278 days late Download Open in new window