AL-AFSAR & REHMAT CHARITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Projects for the needy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Pakistan
Governance
- 07 February 2020: CIO registration
- AL-AFSAR & REHMAT FOUNDATION (Working name)
- AL-AFSAR & RAHMAT CHARITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHOUDHRY RASIB HUSSAIN | Chair | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MUMTAZ BEGUM | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHAREZ HUSSAIN | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2022 | 311 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2020 as amended on 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, WIDOWS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER AND CLOTHING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE ILLITERATE AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES; (3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES SUCH AS TESTING AND TREATMENT CENTRES, AND CLINICS, SUCH AS EYE CAMPS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 ALBION ROAD
SPARKHILL
BIRMINGHAM
B11 2NR
- Phone:
- 07932647568
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window