LINCOLN PRIDE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lincoln Pride raises awareness of LGBTQ issues by staging events, putting on a annual Pride each year and providing support to other LGBTQ charities and voluntary organisations throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 14 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Gary Reid | Chair | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Croll | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Marshall | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Arran Hart | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mikaela Reid | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £60.82k | £9.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £72.39k | £86.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.08k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £71.22k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.42k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £84.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.20k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2025 | 158 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2025 | 158 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2022 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE LIVING IN LINCOLN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) RAISING AWARENESS AND EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE; 2) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH CELEBRATING THE DIVERSITY OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY; AND 3) STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL AND SMALLER EVENTS, INCLUDING REGULAR SOCIAL EVENTS FOR THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN A SAFE ENVIRONMENT THROUGHOUT THE YEAR. 4) PROVIDING FUNDING AND OR GRANTS AND OR DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincoln Pride
35 NEWLAND
LINCOLN
LN1 1XP
- Phone:
- 07387706474
- Email:
- info@lincolnpride.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window