MANCHESTER STREET POEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Projects around arts and wellbeing in marginalised communities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Miller | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Organ | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hiscock | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karl Hyde | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY GREEN | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £33.74k | £57.45k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.18k | £36.55k | £33.75k | £36.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, BY PROVIDING: • ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES, WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT • RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY ISOLATED • SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: HOMELESSNESS, UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL, SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS AND CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Regent Trading Estate
Oldfield Road
Salford
M5 4DE
- Phone:
- 07887808505
- Email:
- simon@mcrstreetpoem.com
- Website:
-
mcrstreetpoem.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window