GIROBANK PLC STAFF WELFARE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sefton
Governance
- 16 April 1985: Standard registration
- 07 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- NATIONAL GIROBANK STAFF WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS EMPLOYED BY THE GIROBANK PLC OR EX-EMPLOYEES OF THE GIROBANK PLC AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. TO ASSIST SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, OBJECTS, OR INSTITUTIONS, AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window