BRITISH KORFBALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We award grants to individuals, amateur korfball clubs and korfball associations within Great Britain to support the advancement of korfball
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JAN BUTTINGER | Chair | 29 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Corinne Buckland | Trustee | 02 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lesley Palfreyman | Trustee | 02 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £5.21k | £6.23k | £10.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.60k | £1.77k | £200 | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF KORFBALL IN GREAT BRITAIN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF KORFBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BUCKS YARD
OAK STREET
NORWICH
NR3 3FA
- Phone:
- 01603219002
- Email:
- PhilipButtinger@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window