ANIMAL WELFARE (FURNESS)

Charity Number: 1189973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A local Community animal charity that provides sanctuary for distressed animals in the Furness and South Lakes area. We help families struggling financially hardship with cost of living crisis. Founded in 1987. Then transitioned to a CIO status on 1 Jan 2023. AWF supports people getting back into work and education for our young people in primary schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £203,038
Total expenditure: £244,661

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 June 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nathaniel Welham Chair 17 June 2020
ANIMAL WELFARE (FURNESS)
Received: On time
Elyzabeth Turner-Dow Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Yvonne Sutherland Trustee 18 October 2023
None on record
Sarah Saunders Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £949.86k £203.04k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £206.63k £244.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £813.29k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £129.81k N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £6.76k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £115.12k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £36.22k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £170.42k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 02 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2022 148 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Animal Welfare (Furness)
210 Dalton Road
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
LA14 1PN
Phone:
01229 811122