Accounts and annual returns DEVON SUPER TEAM

Charity Number: 1191219
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 February 2023 1 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late