Accounts and annual returns RAFAEL'S

Charity number: 1189670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 24 May 2024 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window