YSGOL TY FFYNNON CHILDCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ty Ffynnon Childcare provides wraparound care for all children attending Ysgol Ty Ffynnon. A playgroup is run on Tuesday, Wednesday and Thursday from 9.30am till 11.30am for 2 year olds. Nursery Plus runs from 11.30am until 3pm for parents to access full day care for nursery age children. After school club runs Monday to Friday from 3pm till 5.30pm for all years in the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 14 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nia Goldsmith | Chair | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Thomas | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Mapp-Jones | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Mary Lewis | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Taylor | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.30k | £35.50k | £44.79k | £48.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.46k | £24.17k | £32.58k | £36.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS THROUGH HIGH QUALITY CHILDCARE PROVISION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL TY FFYNNON
KING GEORGE STREET
SHOTTON
DEESIDE
CH5 1HX
- Phone:
- 01244830018
- Email:
- tfmail@hwbcymru.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window