BRIGHTWATER RESEARCH

Charity number: 1191048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the public benefit, the relief of sickness by conducting research into new treatments for various forms of cancers and disseminating the useful results for the public benefit, with a view to making such treatments available to oncology clinicians to treat cancer patients

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £99,181
Total expenditure: £210,023

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Garnett Chair 04 February 2020
None on record
Sonja Miriam Crane Trustee 09 October 2020
None on record
David Robert Crane Trustee 09 October 2020
None on record
Edward Alexander Youngman Trustee 04 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £276.05k £0 £50.36k £99.18k
Total expenditure £51.63k £16.02k £78.21k £210.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 13 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 13 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Acuity Legal Ltd
3 Assembly Square
Britannia Quay
Cardiff
CF10 4PL
Phone:
07790 490589