FRIENDS OF HAWKSWORTH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1187912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £16,685
Total expenditure: £9,191

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 February 2020: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRYONY WYLIE Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Laura Fyfe Trustee 12 February 2020
None on record
Stacy Harpin Trustee 12 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £10.02k £6.38k £11.48k £16.68k
Total expenditure £4.95k £8.12k £9.09k £9.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 09 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HAWKSWORTH C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
MAIN STREET
HAWKSWORTH
LEEDS
LS20 8NX
Phone:
01943872808
Website:

No information available